U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Schilling v. Panther et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Return of Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Jury Demand]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 01, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order]
  • February 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 15, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 24, 2016: [Service]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 22, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 22, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.