U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Pennacchia v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Return of Exhibits]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Return of Exhibits]
  • August 16, 2018: [Return of Exhibits]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Appeal Record Returned]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [USCA Memorandum]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 09, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 09, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Receipt]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 19, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 13, 2016: [Transcript]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 21, 2016: [Trial Brief]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 13, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 10, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • June 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • May 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 27, 2016: [Expedite]
  • May 27, 2016: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • May 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 09, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 06, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 02, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order]
  • April 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • April 26, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 26, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.