U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Paz v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • June 14, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Mandamus]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2016: [Writ of Mandamus]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • June 23, 2016: [Receipt]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • June 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 03, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 27, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 27, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.