U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Austin v. Wasden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 24, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 12, 2017: [Receipt]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 24, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • April 27, 2016: [Complaint]
  • April 27, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • April 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.