U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cv-00550
  • Case Name: Hoak v. Siegert
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Return Mail]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 23, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Letter]
May, 2016
  • May 05, 2016: [Response (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.