U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Hansen v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Return Mail]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • May 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2016: [Waive]
  • May 03, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • April 27, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.