U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Mowers v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • October 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • May 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 25, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.