U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00181
  • Case Name: Baker et al v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 06, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • February 01, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 01, 2017: [Protective Order]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 28, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 11, 2016: [Stay]
  • July 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • June 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • June 09, 2016: [Sanctions]
  • June 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • June 02, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order]
  • May 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 25, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 25, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.