U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Vasquez v. City of Idaho Falls
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [In Limine]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
  • May 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • April 21, 2020: [In Limine]
  • April 20, 2020: [Trial Brief]
  • April 20, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 20, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 20, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
  • April 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 05, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Expedite]
  • April 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [In Limine]
  • February 11, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 15, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Strike]
  • January 13, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • December 13, 2019: [In Limine]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 01, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
  • March 01, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 16, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 16, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 22, 2017: [Errata]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2017: [Strike]
  • November 16, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • November 16, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 07, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 15, 2016: [Dismiss]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Summons Issued]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.