U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Herrera v. State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Return Mail]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • April 26, 2017: [Return Mail]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
  • December 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2016: [Stay]
  • May 02, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 02, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.