U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Simerlink v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 09, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 09, 2016: [Petition for Review]
  • June 03, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 24, 2016: [Expedite]
  • May 24, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 17, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Petition for Review]
  • May 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.