U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Brummett v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 17, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 17, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.