U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00207
  • Case Name: Schvaneveldt v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • May 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 18, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.