U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Select Milk Producers, Inc v. Sorrento Lactalis, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • February 23, 2017: [Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [ADR Plan]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 02, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 14, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 01, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • July 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • July 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 01, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 23, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 20, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.