U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Duffin v. Idaho State University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 29, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: [Supplement]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 21, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 14, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Protective Order]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
  • January 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 27, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2016: [Supplement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.