U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Rafferty v. KeyPoint Government Solutions, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 25, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 25, 2019: [Errata]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 09, 2019: [Errata]
  • October 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2019: [Strike]
  • October 04, 2019: [Seal]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Document]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Errata]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • September 13, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 24, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 03, 2017: [ADR Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Response (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 28, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 28, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 06, 2016: [Set Aside Default]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • September 22, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Status Report]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.