U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Hiroto v. United States Postal Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 27, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 26, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 25, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.