U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00212
  • Case Name: GSL Technology, Inc. et al v. Gemini Technologies, Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 22, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 26, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 05, 2016: [Joinder]
  • August 04, 2016: [Joinder]
  • August 04, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Joinder]
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • May 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 25, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • May 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.