U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Nielson v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 03, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2016: [Supplement]
  • July 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 06, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 26, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.