U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00217
  • Case Name: DeLeon v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Strike]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • August 26, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 27, 2016: [Receipt]
  • May 27, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 26, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 26, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.