U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project et al v. Grimm et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Status Report]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 09, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Status Report]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 13, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 16, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 05, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 01, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 01, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.