U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Comfort v. Choice Hotels International, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement]
  • January 06, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 08, 2016: [Strike]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 10, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 01, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.