U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Ultimate Logistics LLC v. Navistar Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • September 15, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2016: [Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 03, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 03, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.