U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Hurrle v. Snake River Restaurants, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [USCA Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 20, 2017: [Appeal Docketing Statement]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 07, 2017: [Strike]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 14, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 01, 2017: [Supplement]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 31, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • May 18, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Order]
  • April 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 10, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • October 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order]
  • September 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • September 13, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 13, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.