U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Paddock v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Response (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 30, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • July 27, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • July 22, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 30, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 28, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 27, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 03, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 03, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 03, 2016: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.