U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Dade v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Recusal]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Release of Funds]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Vacate]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Request]
  • May 22, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2019: [Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 04, 2019: [Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 21, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2019: [Reconsideration]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Strike]
  • December 21, 2018: [Expedite]
  • December 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 12, 2018: [Strike]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 25, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 25, 2018: [Request]
  • October 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Compel]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 27, 2018: [Clarify]
  • February 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2018: [Clarify]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Recusal]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 25, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • May 08, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • May 04, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 20, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • April 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Set Aside Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 18, 2016: [Errata]
  • August 04, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Compel]
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • July 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 12, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Request]
  • June 29, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 20, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 15, 2016: [Set Aside]
  • June 15, 2016: [Stay]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 06, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.