U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Oregon-Idaho Utilities Inc et al v. Skitter Cable TV Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 10, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 21, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 31, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 30, 2016: [Transfer Case]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 30, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • August 30, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • August 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 26, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 19, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.