U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cv-00563
  • Case Name: Cacciaguidi v. Reinke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Receipt]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.