U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:09-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Cacciaguidi v. Reinke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 26, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order]
  • September 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Vacate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.