U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00231
  • Case Name: United States of America v. U.S. Currency in the Approximate Amount of $37,152 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Service by Publication]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 05, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • June 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.