U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00232
  • Case Name: Scott v. Bish's RV, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 11, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
  • March 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 03, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 03, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Consent Filed]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.