U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Bolen v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Attorney on Appeal]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 22, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • June 10, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 09, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 09, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 09, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.