U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00234
  • Case Name: Premier Capital, LLC v. TCS Idaho, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Summons Issued]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order]
  • June 10, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 09, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.