U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Frazier et al v. Micron Technology, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Registered to do business in the State of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 14, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order]
  • August 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2016
  • July 31, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.