U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Hopkins Growth Fund, LLC v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2016: [Appellees Brief]
September, 2016
  • September 02, 2016: [Excerpt of Record]
  • September 02, 2016: [Appellants Brief]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order]
  • August 10, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Consolidate Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.