U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Ramsey v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Reconsideration]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Consent Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Receipt]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 14, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.