U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Baker v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 12, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • March 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • June 14, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 14, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.