U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Ada County v. United Insurance Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 19, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 04, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 15, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • July 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 08, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 15, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 15, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 14, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 14, 2016: [Declaration]
  • June 14, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.