U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Woolf v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 05, 2017: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 15, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 15, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.