U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Riley v. City of Sandpoint et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Waive]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 16, 2016: [Waive]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.