U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Moore v. Corizon Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 05, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 07, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2018: [Letter]
  • April 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Stay]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2017: [Issuance]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2016: [Letter]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 16, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 16, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.