U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Keiser v. American National Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 22, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 20, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement]
  • December 06, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [ADR Plan]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 17, 2016: [Statement]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 23, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 16, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.