U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Reyna v. Lowes Home Centers LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Vacate]
  • June 20, 2016: [Objection]
  • June 20, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order]
  • June 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 17, 2016: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • June 16, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 16, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.