U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Sanderson v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 20, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • September 20, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 24, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 22, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 21, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • June 21, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 17, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.