U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Neault et al v. Epley's, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 15, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2018: [In Limine]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2018: [Errata]
  • November 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 30, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Supplement]
  • December 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • November 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • November 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
  • July 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Vacate]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 29, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 06, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.