U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Goodrick v. Idaho Department of Correction et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [USCA Memorandum]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [USCA Order]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 17, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 21, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Stay]
  • June 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Supplement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 06, 2018: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2018: [Strike]
  • May 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Request]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: [Errata]
  • April 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2018: [Stay]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sanctions]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Reassign Case]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 12, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 01, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Consent Filed]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 20, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 20, 2016: [Complaint]
  • June 20, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.