U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Vasquez-Reyes v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 03, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • November 03, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Response (generic)]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 20, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.