U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Wisdom v. Gugino et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Letter]
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 03, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 19, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 21, 2016: [Certificate of Readiness]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Bankruptcy Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • June 21, 2016: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.