U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Clevenger v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 21, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.