U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Blackeagle v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 04, 2016: [Supplement]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • July 27, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 18, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • June 21, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.